U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00202-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PACHECO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Error]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • July 19, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Courtroom Change]
  • July 11, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 11, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 07, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • June 07, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 07, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 06, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.