U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00206-1
  • Case Name: USA v. STALLANS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Re-entry Progress Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • October 18, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Proposed Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • June 30, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 30, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • June 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 29, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • June 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.