U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00207-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BOKOSKI et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • December 27, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • December 27, 2022: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 10, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 28, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 07, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 08, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 08, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 06, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.