U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00203-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SNIDER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • October 12, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Suppress]
  • July 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 13, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 13, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 13, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • June 08, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 06, 2022: [Indictment]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 06, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.