U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-10007-
  • Case Name: Onyewuchi v. Mekonnen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Returned Mail]
  • September 15, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 12, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order - Generic]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order]
  • August 17, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing - Continued (AP)]
June, 2022
  • June 18, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 18, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Appearance (Attorney)]
  • June 15, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • June 13, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • June 10, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • June 08, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • June 07, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.