U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00208-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KELLY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • November 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 10, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 10, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Status Conference]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Exclude]
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 06, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Courtroom Change]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.