U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00210-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FERREIRA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Probation Order]
  • January 01, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 01, 2023: [Probation Order]
  • January 01, 2023: [Order on Motion for Return of Passport]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2022: [Return of Passport ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 20, 2022: [Alter Judgment ]
  • November 20, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 14, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 07, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 02, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone]
  • September 12, 2022: [Appear by Telephone]
  • September 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 09, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 23, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • June 23, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • June 23, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • June 23, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 10, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 09, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 08, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.