U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00098
  • Case Name: Angela M Taitano
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 No Asset (Discharged)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • September 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order for Relief]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • July 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
  • July 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Receipt of Final Installment Payment]
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Relief from Stay]
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • July 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Show Cause Failure to Pay Installments]
  • July 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order To Show Cause Failure To Pay Installments]
June, 2022
  • June 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • June 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • June 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • June 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • June 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • June 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • June 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • June 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • June 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • June 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Record of Any Interest in Sect. 521(c) Acct or Program (Original or Amended)]
  • June 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Record of Any Interest in Sect. 521(c) Acct or Program (Original or Amended)]
  • June 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • June 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • June 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • June 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • June 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • June 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • June 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • June 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • June 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • June 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • June 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.