U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GABRINSKI
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • June 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • June 18, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 18, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • June 17, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 17, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Medical Exam ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Medical Exam ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.