U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-sc-09999
  • Case Name: REDACTED SCA 18 U.S.C. 2703(a),(c) & (d) DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO STANDING ORDER NO. 22-05 (BAH)
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
December, 2024
  • December 04, 2024: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Documents Upon Close of Investigation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.