U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 08, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • July 06, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • July 05, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • July 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 01, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [Stay]
  • July 01, 2022: [Review]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Stay]
  • June 29, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • June 28, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • June 24, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • June 21, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 12, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 12, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • June 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 12, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • June 12, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 12, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • June 12, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 12, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.