U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00213-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 06, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 29, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • June 29, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 29, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 29, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • June 22, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.