U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KELLEY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 22, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • June 21, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 18, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 18, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 15, 2022: [Errata]
  • June 14, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 13, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.