U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00204-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HINSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • January 13, 2023: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Disclosure ]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 24, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 21, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 21, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 17, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • June 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 13, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • June 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 13, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 13, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • June 13, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.