U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00214-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MAZZIO, JR
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Voluntarily Surrender]
  • October 28, 2022: [Voluntarily Surrender]
  • October 17, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 17, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 06, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 06, 2022: [Sentencing]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • June 24, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 24, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 24, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 24, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 17, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • June 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 13, 2022: [Statement of Facts in Support of Plea Agreement ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.