U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00100
  • Case Name: Boris Clayron Lloyd
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • September 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Schedule C]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order To Show Cause]
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors Not Held]
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors Continued (TRUSTEE ONLY 341 Filings)]
  • September 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Support Document]
August, 2022
  • August 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • August 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • August 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Amended List of Creditors and Schedules (Adding, Deleting, Changes to Debt Amount or Reclassificati]
  • August 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • August 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors Continued (TRUSTEE ONLY 341 Filings)]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • June 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • June 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • June 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • June 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • June 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • June 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • June 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • June 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • June 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • June 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • June 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • June 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • June 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • June 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • June 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.