U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CALHOUN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Waiver]
  • January 04, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Waiver]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Exclude]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 09, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • June 17, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 17, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.