U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00215-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TAYLOR
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 07, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 04, 2024: [Sentencing]
  • October 03, 2024: [Status Report]
  • October 01, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 30, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 30, 2024: [.Order]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 07, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Exclude]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 21, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 14, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.