U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00211-1
  • Case Name: USA v. INGRAHAM
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Status Report]
  • December 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 02, 2022: [Status Report]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • October 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • October 07, 2022: [Suppress]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • September 11, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • July 11, 2022: [Transcript]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 15, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.