U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00134-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BRATJAN, JR
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 18, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • July 15, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Disclosure ]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 15, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.