U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00060
  • Case Name: In Re: NON-PARTY SUBPOENAS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Transcript]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • July 12, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 15, 2022: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.