U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ISAACS et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 26, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • July 22, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Protective Order ]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 24, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 24, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 17, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • June 15, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 15, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.