U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00216-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WALLS-KAUFMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 19, 2023: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 19, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 19, 2023: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 19, 2023: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 07, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Protective Order ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 28, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.