U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00217-2
  • Case Name: USA v. HALLON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 14, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • June 30, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 29, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 23, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.