U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DAVIS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 22, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Protective Order]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 29, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Exclude]
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • June 21, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • June 21, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • June 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • June 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 17, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • June 17, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.