U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00101
  • Case Name: 819D LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Proof of Claim Attachment 3001(c)(1) and (d)]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Operating Report]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • November 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • November 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Operating Report]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • October 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Operating Report]
  • October 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Employ]
  • October 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice - Possible Dividends]
  • October 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Chapter 7 Notice of Possible Dividend - Asset Designation]
  • October 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Employ]
  • October 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice - Generic]
  • September 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Removal]
  • September 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice - Generic]
  • September 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • September 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • September 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice - Generic]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Brief]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • August 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Motion - Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
  • August 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
  • August 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Opposition]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Fee Due (Create Outstanding Fee)]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appearance (Attorney)]
  • August 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
  • August 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • August 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • August 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • August 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims (Original or Amended)]
  • August 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule E/F]
  • August 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • August 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit]
  • August 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
  • August 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • August 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • August 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Opposition]
  • August 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • August 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • August 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Removal]
  • August 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Opposition]
  • August 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • August 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • August 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Opposition]
  • August 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Consent Order]
  • August 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • August 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • August 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Opportunity to Object (Correction)]
  • August 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Removal]
  • July 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • July 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Condition Rights]
  • July 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • July 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Opportunity to Object (Correction)]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Remand]
  • July 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appearance (Attorney)]
  • July 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice - Generic]
  • July 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Change of Address]
  • July 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • July 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Electronic Deficiency - No Attorney Identifiers]
  • July 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • July 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice - Generic]
  • July 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended List of Creditors and Schedules (Adding, Deleting, Changes to Debt Amount or Reclassificati]
  • July 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Matrix or Schedules: Change EXISITING Name and/or Address]
  • July 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • July 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • July 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Corporate Ownership]
  • July 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Equity Security Holders (Original or Amended)]
  • July 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedules A/B-J]
  • July 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • July 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
June, 2022
  • June 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (BK)]
  • June 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Missing Documents]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to File Required Documents]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [First Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Directing Debtor's Attorney to File LBR 2016-2(a) Statement]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order To File Missing Documents]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order to File Required Documents]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • June 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.