U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00220-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SMITH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Attorneys' Acknowledgment of Trial Exhibits]
  • December 28, 2022: [Verdict Form ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Signature of Foreperson..... (STAYS SEALED)]
  • December 28, 2022: [Jury Notes ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util- Jury Verdict]
  • December 15, 2022: [Signature of Foreperson..... (STAYS SEALED)]
  • December 15, 2022: [Jury Notes ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 13, 2022: [Minute Order for Jury Meals]
  • December 13, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • December 12, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • December 12, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • December 05, 2022: [Witness List]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 25, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 17, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • November 11, 2022: [Suppress]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 10, 2022: [Impeach]
  • November 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Proposed Briefing Schedule]
  • November 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2022: [Proposed Briefing Schedule]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 01, 2022: [Status Conference]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • July 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 28, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • July 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 25, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • July 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 25, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 25, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 25, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 25, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.