U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TILLEY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Exclude]
  • October 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Protective Order ]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • June 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 22, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 21, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 21, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.