U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00221-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GABRINSKI
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Protective Order ]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 26, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 20, 2022: [.Order]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Indictment]
  • June 21, 2022: [.Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.