U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00103
  • Case Name: Delshon Davis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • August 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
July, 2022
  • July 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Change of Address]
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Payment of Fee (Installment Payment)]
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Personal Financial Managment Course]
  • June 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • June 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to File Required Documents]
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to File 121 Statement]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order File Form 121 Statement]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order to File Required Documents]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.