U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00104-
  • Case Name: 1712 Property Holding Trust
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order To Close Case - Ch 11 (Dismissed)]
  • July 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Dismiss Case (Judge)]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Motion - Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
  • June 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • June 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Missing Documents]
  • June 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
  • June 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to File Required Documents]
  • June 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - File Matrix]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Directing Compliance]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order to File Required Documents]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order To File Matrix]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order To File Missing Documents]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [First Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.