U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00222-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KELLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2022: [Exclude]
  • September 27, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Transcript]
  • July 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 07, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 05, 2022: [Protective Order ]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 22, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 22, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.