U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00105-
  • Case Name: Frederick Earle
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • September 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Personal Financial Managment Course]
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order Denying Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • August 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • August 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • August 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • August 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
  • August 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors Continued (TRUSTEE ONLY 341 Filings)]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice]
  • July 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice - Generic]
  • July 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement Regarding Authorization of Bankruptcy Case Filing]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Amended Voluntary Petition]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Schedule C]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Amended Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • July 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (BK)]
  • July 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • June 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • June 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Service - Statement re Filing Authorization]
  • June 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - File Amended Matrix Cover Sheet or Show Cause]
  • June 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - File Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities]
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order To File Summary Of Your Assets And Liabilities]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order To File Amended Matrix With Cover Sheet Or Show Cause]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order to File Statement Whether Case Was Authorized]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Tax Documents]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Declaration by BPP - Form 119]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Disclosure of Compensation of BPP for Debtor]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.