U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00143-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SPEED
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Travel ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • June 30, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • June 24, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 24, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 23, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 23, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.