U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00225-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HUESO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 05, 2022: [Status Report]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 27, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 27, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.