U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00108
  • Case Name: NTN Management Corp.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • June 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • June 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)]
  • June 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Support Document]
  • June 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Support Document]
  • June 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • June 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • June 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.