U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00224-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COLGAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 20, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Modifying Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • September 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 12, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 12, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • July 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 30, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 26, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.