U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LOGAN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 04, 2022: [Protective Order ]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to Indict]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 27, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.