U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00109-
  • Case Name: HP West Baltimore, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Amended Application to Employ]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Employ]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Employ]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury - Form 202]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Employ]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jefferson, Patricia B. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Abandon]
  • September 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Employ]
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order]
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • September 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • September 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Motion - Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
  • September 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Objection]
  • September 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Report of Disputed Election]
  • September 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order]
  • September 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Reply]
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Opposition]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Motion - Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Exhibit]
  • August 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Amended Application/Motion]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Expedite Hearing]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens]
  • August 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Motion to Compel]
  • August 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Abandon]
  • August 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Employ]
  • August 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • August 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Appointing Successor Trustee]
  • August 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Resignation of Interim Trustee]
  • August 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Resignation of Interim Trustee]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Request to Withdraw Document]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Change Venue/Inter-district Transfer - Bankruptcy]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to File Required Documents]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - File Matrix]
  • July 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Set First Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • July 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order to File Required Documents]
  • July 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order To File Matrix]
  • July 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order For Relief Ch 7]
  • July 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Involuntary Summons Service Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Summons Issued - Involuntary]
  • June 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • June 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.