U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00226-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MATTOCKS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 11, 2023: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 11, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 11, 2023: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 11, 2023: [Referred for PSI Report]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Exclude]
  • December 01, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • November 02, 2022: [.Order]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • October 31, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • October 23, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 06, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Exclude]
  • October 05, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Exclude]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Status Report]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 19, 2022: [Exclude]
July, 2022
  • July 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 22, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 07, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Protective Order ]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • June 27, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Placement in High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 27, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 27, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Placement in High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • June 27, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 27, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.