U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00229-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LITTLE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Order directing action by Probation Office]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 01, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • July 01, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 01, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • July 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 01, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • July 01, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • July 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 29, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 28, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.