U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00111
  • Case Name: Kamari Rashon Torres
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 No Asset (Discharged)]
  • October 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Amended Matrix or Schedules: Change EXISITING Name and/or Address]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
July, 2022
  • July 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
  • July 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • June 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • June 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • June 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • June 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • June 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • June 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • June 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • June 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • June 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • June 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • June 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.