U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SIRR
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • July 26, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order]
  • July 21, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 08, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 30, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 29, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.