U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00059
  • Case Name: SUPERIOR COURT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA CRIMINAL JUSTICE ACT ATTORNEY SELECTION COMMITTEE SUPERIOR COURT CRIMINAL RULE 44-I HEARING et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Case Remanded to Superior Court]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • November 14, 2022: [Memorandum & Opinion]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • August 17, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • August 09, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • August 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Quash]
  • July 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
  • July 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for CM/ECF Password]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Motion]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.