U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00228-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOHNSON, JR
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • January 09, 2023: [Amended Judgment]
  • January 04, 2023: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • January 04, 2023: [Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 20, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone]
  • November 09, 2022: [Appear by Telephone]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • August 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 10, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • August 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • August 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 10, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • July 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.