U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00115-
  • Case Name: Victoria Harriet Hall
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 (Dismissed)]
  • November 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Pay Filing Fee in Full]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order To Pay Filing Fee in Full]
  • November 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order Dismiss Case]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • October 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order on Generic Motion ]
  • September 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Have the Filing Fee Waived]
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order]
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors (by Trustee)]
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Motion - Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
August, 2022
  • August 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors (by Trustee)]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • August 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • July 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Schedule E/F]
  • July 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Schedule D]
  • July 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • July 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Schedule J]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Schedule I]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Schedule H]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Schedule G]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Schedule C]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Schedule A/B]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • July 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • July 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to File Required Documents]
  • July 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order to File Required Documents]
  • June 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • June 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • June 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • June 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • June 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • June 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Application to Have the Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • June 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.