U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00148-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TAMJONG
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Exclude]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Exclude]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 01, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [Warrant Quashed]
  • July 01, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • June 30, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 30, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.