U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00230-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JACKSON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 22, 2025: [Transcript]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 17, 2023: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Transcript]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • October 21, 2022: [Large Additional Attachment(s)]
  • October 21, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 21, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 15, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 09, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release with Global Positioning System Monitoring]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • August 26, 2022: [Revoke]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 21, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • August 13, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 03, 2022: [Revoke]
  • August 03, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 02, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Indictment]
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 12, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 08, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 06, 2022: [.Order]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.