U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00232-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HEATHCOTE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 04, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 04, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • November 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 04, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 25, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Proposed Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • July 15, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 15, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • July 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.