U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00234-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHASE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • October 07, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • October 06, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • September 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 24, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 19, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Suppress]
  • August 15, 2022: [Disclosure ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 27, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • July 08, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 08, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 08, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 08, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • July 08, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 08, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • July 05, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.